Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Leroy Monteith, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Knaphle, Thomas Lawrence, against Nordia N. Hoff, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher P Baker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
January 27, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
January 21, 2022 | COMPLAINT | ||
January 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 03, 2022 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
January 03, 2022 | JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
January 03, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
January 03, 2022 | INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT | ||
January 03, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF | ||
January 03, 2022 | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.