Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, For Conseco Finance Home Equity Loan Trust 2002-C, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Leopold, Saul O, against And If They Be Dead, Any And All Persons Unknown To Plaintiff, Claiming, Or Who May Claim To Have An Interest In, Or Generally Or Specific Lien Upon The Real Property Described In This Action, Any And All Persons Deriving Interest In Or Lien Upon, Or Title To Said Real Property By, Through Or Under Them, Or Either Of Them, And Their Respective Wives, Widows, Husbands, Widowers, Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin, Arnot Medical Services Pc, Descendants, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Legatees, Creditors, Trustees, Committees, Lienors And Assigns, All Of Who And Whose Names, Except As Stated, Are Unknown To Plaintiff, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher P Baker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
And If They Be Dead, Any And All Persons Unknown To Plaintiff, Claiming, Or Who May Claim To Have An Interest In, Or Generally Or Specific Lien Upon The Real Property Described In This Action
Any And All Persons Deriving Interest In Or Lien Upon, Or Title To Said Real Property By, Through Or Under Them, Or Either Of Them, And Their Respective Wives, Widows, Husbands, Widowers, Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin
Descendants, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Legatees, Creditors, Trustees, Committees, Lienors And Assigns, All Of Who And Whose Names, Except As Stated, Are Unknown To Plaintiff
Such Unknown Persons Being Herein Generally Described And Intended To Be Included In The Following Designation, Namely
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Exhibit A from Certificate of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Exhibit 1 from Hardship Declaration Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2023 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
December 01, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) Letter of Withdrawal of Motion for a Combined Order of Default Judgment and Judgment of Foreclosure Letter of Withdrawal of Motion for a Combined Order of Default Judgment and Judgment of Foreclosure ... show more |
||
November 23, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 23, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
November 23, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Motion for Discontinuance |
||
November 23, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE (Motion #3) Notice of Motion for an Order Discontinuing Action, Canceling Lis Pendens, Discharging the Guardian Notice of Motion for an Order Discontinuing Action, Canceling Lis Pendens, Discharging the Guardian ... show more |
||
November 09, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #2) Conformed Notice of Motion |
||
November 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #2) Exhibit Q - Death Certificate, Surrogate Search, Deed Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit Q - Death Certificate, Surrogate Search, Deed Redacted |
||
November 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #2) Exhibit P - Power of Attorney |
||
November 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #2) Exhibit M - Affirmation of Regularity |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.