Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Donna J. Kobbe, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Hughes, Diana L., against Arnot Health, Inc., Arnot Ogden Medical Center, Subramaniam Sadhasivam Md, represented by Callocchia, Tomas James, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher P Baker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 13, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 25, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
February 09, 2023 | ORDER - PRE-TRIAL | ||
January 26, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 27, 2022 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue |
||
December 23, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 07, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Order Directing Preliminary Conference |
||
November 09, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 09, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to the Court - Request Conference |
||
January 20, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
January 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Mail of Answer and Demands upon Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.