Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
New City Funding Corp., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stein, Mark H, against Mason Shephard, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher P Baker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 21, 2020ORDER - AWARDING FEE Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 12, 2021AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 21, 2020EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: June 03, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 18, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: July 13, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 12, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT military status |
||
June 14, 2021 |
ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1) Order Awarding Attorneys Fees and Authorizing Entry of Default Judgment |
||
June 03, 2021 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
June 03, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Military Status |
||
June 03, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing |
||
June 03, 2021 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
June 03, 2021 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
January 18, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-MASON SHEPHARD -46661280 |
||
January 18, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.