Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alsco, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Paesano'S Pizza & Subs, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher P Baker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - a
Date: December 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - b
Date: December 21, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: August 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - c
Date: December 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 01, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 14, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 26, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) worksheet |
||
August 26, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
August 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) services agreement |
||
August 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint |
||
August 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) service agreement |
||
August 26, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.