Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Barreto, Jonathan Alexander, Flynn, Gerald W, Flynn, Kerri S, Sheerin, John J, against Michael Oppenheim, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher P Baker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIRMATION
Date: October 12, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 11, 2020NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: October 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 12, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION AFFIDAVIT AND NON MILITARY |
||
October 12, 2023 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) NOT OF DEF LTR and STIPULATION |
||
October 12, 2023 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) order with notice of entry |
||
September 18, 2023 | ORDER - FINAL | ||
August 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation and Non Military |
||
August 09, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) Conformed Notice Of Motion |
||
August 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #1) proposed order |
||
August 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION PAGE |
||
August 09, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) affidavit of service and blueback |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.