Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
State Of New York Mortgage Agency, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Griffith, Kelly C., against Arnot Ogden Medical Center, Kelley A Johnson, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, State Of New York Mortgage Agency, Steven Thompson, (total of 5) See All represented by Roy, Brian Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher P Baker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: June 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 19, 2021REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: June 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 19, 2021REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: June 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: June 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 30, 2021JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: October 04, 2021OATH
Date: June 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 19, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #2) Affirmation of Vacancy Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 19, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 19, 2021JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE (PROPOSED) - VACANT/ABANDONED PROPERTY
Date: July 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Plaintiff's Affidavit of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 19, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: September 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
June 13, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
December 08, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Entry of Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale and Referee's Notice of Sale |
||
October 04, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
July 21, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 19, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR Summons and Complaint Redacted |
||
July 19, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) Order of Reference |
||
July 19, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) for Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
July 19, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Bill of Costs |
||
July 19, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) COVID-19 Affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.