Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Hayden, Hon. James T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayden, Hon. James T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2016 |
CategorySp-Cplr Article 78 (Body Or Officer) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Case Cycle Time193 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Return Date (Motion #001) Hayden (Motion Part) Judge: Hayden, Hon. James T. |
|
March 24, 2016 | Hearing |
Pre-Transfer to Appellate Hayden (Court Activity) Judge: Hayden, Hon. James T. |
|
March 24, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Hayden (Motion Part) Judge: Hayden, Hon. James T. |
|
November 13, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Hayden (Motion Part) Judge: Hayden, Hon. James T. |
|
September 14, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 03/24/2016Decided Before Justice: Hayden, Hon. James T. Answer demanded: No Judge: Hayden, Hon. James T. |
|
September 14, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 11/13/2015Decided Before Justice: Hayden, Hon. James T. Answer demanded: No Judge: Hayden, Hon. James T. |
|
September 14, 2015 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Hayden (Motion Part) Judge: Hayden, Hon. James T. |
|
September 14, 2015 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #002) Hayden (Motion Part) Judge: Hayden, Hon. James T. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.