Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Om-Other case in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with O'Shea, Hon. Judith F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeO'Shea, Hon. Judith F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2015 |
CategoryOm-Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time38 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2015 | Hearing |
Return Date (Motion #001) O'Shea (Motion Part) Judge: O'Shea, Hon. Judith F. |
|
April 14, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) O'Shea (Motion Part) Judge: O'Shea, Hon. Judith F. |
|
April 13, 2015 | Hearing |
Withdrawn O'Shea (Court Activity) Judge: O'Shea, Hon. Judith F. |
|
March 10, 2015 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) O'Shea (Motion Part) Judge: O'Shea, Hon. Judith F. |
|
March 10, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 04/14/2015Decided Before Justice: O'Shea, Hon. Judith F. Answer demanded: No Judge: O'Shea, Hon. Judith F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.