Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Julie B Hewitt, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Hewitt, Julie Burdick, against Timothy C Hewitt, represented by Saglimben, Michael John, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel J Furlong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Furlong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
March 22, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 14, 2021 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
June 04, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
June 04, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
June 03, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 25, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
May 25, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
May 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION (AFFIDAVIT) OF REGULARITY | ||
May 25, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.