Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kimberly Blanchard, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Drago, Kelly Kathleen, Lamancuso, John Ignatius, against Jonathan Blanchard, represented by Calimeri, Joseph Michael, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts with Grace Hanlon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrace Hanlon Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions63 days |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 17, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 13, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
October 12, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sealed |
||
October 12, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Sealed |
||
October 12, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Sealed |
||
October 12, 2022 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Sealed |
||
March 22, 2021 |
QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER Sealed |
||
March 19, 2021 |
QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) Sealed |
||
February 01, 2021 |
COURT NOTICE Sealed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.