Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Ronald G Troutman Jr, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE |
||
September 29, 2021 | NOTICE | ||
September 20, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
September 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 15, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 18, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.