Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Brian Hinman, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 04, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: March 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2022NOTICE
Date: September 24, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 11, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: March 15, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
March 17, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 15, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
||
March 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIRMATION |
||
March 15, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT |
||
March 15, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER | ||
March 15, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 INVOICE FOR SERVICE |
||
March 15, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | ||
March 15, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF NON EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
March 15, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.