Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Clarke, Elizabeth Ann, Jakas, Joseph Karl, Verhagen, Jason P, against Stephen N Spaulding, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts with Grace Hanlon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrace Hanlon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 21, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: April 13, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 13, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 13, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 13, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected*
Date: February 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2022ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 09, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 09, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: April 13, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 13, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 09, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 09, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: June 14, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Invoice |
||
June 09, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry w/Order |
||
June 09, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
June 09, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Military Investigation |
||
June 09, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 09, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Statement for Judgment |
||
May 24, 2022 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
April 13, 2022 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
April 13, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.