Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Amber R Mason, Daniel G Mason, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Thierfeldt, Lori L., against Kim Mason, represented by Rankin, Richard Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts with Grace Hanlon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrace Hanlon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Breach Of Fiduciary Duty) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP *Corrected*
Date: January 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 19, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - a
Date: January 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 19, 2021ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: February 04, 2021ORDER - FINAL
Date: February 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S)  - c  (Motion #5)
Date: April 26, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 03, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: January 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - d
Date: January 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - c
Date: January 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 29, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 26, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 29, 2021ANSWER
Date: April 16, 2021ORDER - FINAL
Date: March 31, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S)  - a  (Motion #5)
Date: April 26, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 26, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 05, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 03, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 17, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: July 15, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 15, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 28, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: May 07, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: July 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 05, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 19, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8) *Corrected*
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8) *Corrected*
Date: August 19, 2021ORDER - EXPARTE
Date: October 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 19, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 01, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - a  (Motion #10)
Date: February 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 12, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 28, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: May 10, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 03, 2021ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: December 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S)  - c  (Motion #10)
Date: February 21, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: August 04, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #11)
Date: August 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #11)
Date: July 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 28, 2022ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: August 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - d  (Motion #10)
Date: February 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - e  (Motion #10)
Date: February 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - f  (Motion #10)
Date: February 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 12, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 28, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 12, 2022ORDER - FINAL
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 21, 2022ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 21, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: October 18, 2022DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B1 Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: February 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #12)
Date: January 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #12)
Date: January 02, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: January 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #12)
Date: January 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #12)
Date: January 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #12)
Date: January 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 02, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #12)
Date: January 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #12)
Date: January 02, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 05, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) | ||
January 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #12) Original summons & complaint |
||
January 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #12) Order granting leave to amend complaint |
||
January 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #12) Motion seeking leave to amend complaint |
||
January 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #12) CPLR 3012 |
||
January 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #12) NYSCEG Document List (as of 28 Dec 2022) |
||
January 02, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
January 02, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #12) 22 NYCRR 202.21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.