Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Budget Rental Units Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Weinmann, Peter Allen, against Jamestown City Of, represented by Raimondo, Elliot Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts with Lynn W Keane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn W Keane Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 10, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Tax Certiorari) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 15, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2020 |
ORDER - OTHER CONSENT ORDER |
||
October 15, 2020 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
August 06, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
August 05, 2020 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 28, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE service by mail |
||
July 28, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on a natural person |
||
July 10, 2020 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
July 10, 2020 | NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) | ||
July 10, 2020 | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) | ||
July 10, 2020 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.