Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kenneth Cannata, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Calimeri, Joseph Michael, against David Parker Estate, Katherine E Parker -Ex, represented by Robbins, Dale C, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts with Lynn W Keane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn W Keane Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 01, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: July 08, 2020SUMMONS
Date: July 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 01, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 01, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: July 08, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 08, 2020ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 01, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: July 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Division Line |
||
March 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Soliciation |
||
March 08, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
February 01, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Daniel L. Barry Survey |
||
February 01, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Contract between Defendant and Keefes |
||
February 01, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit #A - Notice of Pendency |
||
February 01, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint |
||
February 01, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 01, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.