Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Helena Barbara Flores, Matter To Change Name, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case represented by Calabrese, Calcedonio Wade, against Helena Ariannick Kennedy, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts Chautauqua County Supreme Court with David W Foley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W Foley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Name Change |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseChautauqua County Supreme Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | |
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - AMENDED Amended name change signed 10/4/19 |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - FINAL | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
PETITION *Corrected* Certification of Vital Records |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: 202.6(b) *Corrected* Other, Petition and Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.