Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, Ostrowski, Melissa, against John C Cournean, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts Chautauqua County Supreme Court with James Dillon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Dillon Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions205 days |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseChautauqua County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time592 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)
Date: May 21, 2018ORDER - FINAL (Motion #2)
Date: August 05, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: July 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - FINAL (Motion #2) | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Mailing for Notice of Motion and Proposed Order |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service with Proof of Service for IS |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Information Subpoena |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
July 14, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.