Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, Mulvaney, Colleen Mary, against Victor Echevarria, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts Chautauqua County Supreme Court with James Dillon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Dillon Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions330 days |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseChautauqua County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 06, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 11, 2017STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: March 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM (Motion #1) | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) RJI |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing Motion to the Defendant |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed Order |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Contract with Atty Fee Provision |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Military Verification |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) FSC Summons, Compliant and Affidavit of Service |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Additional Mailing |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1) Affidavit of Facts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.