Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, Ostrowski, Melissa, against Elder Gonzalez, Elder Samayoa, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts Chautauqua County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions681 days |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseChautauqua County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time687 days |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: March 27, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 11, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 23, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 28, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 11, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Payment History |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION Attorney's Affirmation |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.