Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Superior Courts with JAMES H. DILLON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAMES H. DILLON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2012 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2012 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED DILLON (Court Activity) Judge: JAMES H. DILLON |
|
September 14, 2012 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) DILLON (Motion Part) Judge: JAMES H. DILLON |
|
September 14, 2012 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) DILLON (Motion Part) Judge: JAMES H. DILLON |
|
September 10, 2012 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) DILLON (Motion Part) Judge: JAMES H. DILLON |
|
September 10, 2012 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) DILLON (Motion Part) Judge: JAMES H. DILLON |
|
September 07, 2012 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) DILLON (Motion Part) Judge: JAMES H. DILLON |
|
September 07, 2012 | Motion |
PRO HAC VICE (Motion #002) Decided: 09/14/2012GRANTED, ATTY TO SO, GL RPTR Before Justice: JAMES H. DILLON Answer demanded: No Judge: JAMES H. DILLON |
|
August 31, 2012 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DILLON (Prelim. Conference) Judge: JAMES H. DILLON |
|
August 21, 2012 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) DILLON (Motion Part) Judge: JAMES H. DILLON |
|
August 21, 2012 | Motion |
OTSC COMPEL WKRS COMP CARRIER (Motion #001) Decided: 09/14/2012RESERVE DECISION, FILE JHD TAB Before Justice: JAMES H. DILLON Answer demanded: No Judge: JAMES H. DILLON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.