Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Ali Bristol, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 07, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Discontinuance |
||
August 22, 2023 | NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE) | ||
August 15, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
July 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
July 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 27, 2023 | Affidavit of Facts and Sale of Acct by Orig Cred | ||
April 10, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 07, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 07, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.