Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Americu Credit Union, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Lottermoser, Jeffrey Thomas, Radel, Patrick Gerard, against Lisa Power, The Red Light Spa, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas G Leone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas G Leone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint is filed by Americu Credit Union against The Red Light Spa, Inc. and Lisa Power. Americu Credit Union is a credit union chartered and governed by the laws of the State of New York. The complaint alleges that Americu Credit Union loaned...
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 10, 2023ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: August 10, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 22, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: February 22, 2023SUMMONS
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Exhibit E-Transaction history Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #01)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #01)
Date: May 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #01)
Date: May 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 27, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #01)
Date: May 15, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #01)
Date: May 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #01)
Date: May 15, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #01)
Date: May 15, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2023 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment |
||
August 10, 2023 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
August 10, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 27, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01) Order Awarding Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees |
||
May 16, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #01) Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees |
||
May 16, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Service Via First Class Mail of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' Affidavit of Service Via First Class Mail of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' ... show more |
||
May 15, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01) Plaintiff's Notice of Motion for Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees |
||
May 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #01) Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Service Via First Class Mail of Bare Summons on Defendant, Lisa Power |
||
May 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #01) Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Filed Summons and Verified Complaint |
||
May 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation of Jeffery T. Lottermoser, Jr., Esq., in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgm Affirmation of Jeffery T. Lottermoser, Jr., Esq., in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgm ... show more |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.