Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Jordan N Wilson, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 18, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2022 | EXECUTION | ||
October 05, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
December 15, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1407350 | ||
December 15, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1407350 |
||
December 15, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1407350 |
||
December 15, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1407350 |
||
December 15, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1407350 |
||
December 15, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 18, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 18, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.