Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against J Justin Woods, represented by Woods, J. Justin, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 24, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
September 24, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Payment has been made |
||
August 24, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
August 23, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 23, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 28, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.