Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jackie Weisbrod-Moore, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Coletti, Sara A, Constantino, Cynthia Anne, Duquin, Scott Michael, against Cayuga County, Does 1-10, represented by Peterman, Alan R, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Deborah Chimes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeborah Chimes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
COMPLAINT
Date: May 28, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #01)
Date: July 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #01)
Date: July 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #01)
Date: July 27, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 27, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: December 28, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: July 27, 2021SUMMONS
Date: May 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: July 27, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #01)
Date: February 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #01)
Date: July 27, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: March 22, 2022DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT
Date: January 26, 2022ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #01)
Date: December 31, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #01)
Date: February 04, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: March 28, 2022ANSWER
Date: February 11, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #01)
Date: December 31, 2021ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: February 02, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #01)
Date: February 02, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #01)
Date: February 04, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT Â (Motion #01)
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #01)
Date: February 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL record on appeal |
||
March 28, 2022 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
March 22, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
February 11, 2022 |
ANSWER of behalf of Defendant Cayuga County |
||
February 11, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Answer |
||
February 04, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) for Notice of Appeal |
||
February 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #01) to Notice to Appeal - Decision Appealed from |
||
February 04, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #01) of Decision denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss |
||
February 02, 2022 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
February 02, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #01) of Order Denying Defendant Cayuga County's Motion to Dismiss |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.