Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Esl Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Connors, Mary Mcauley, against Patrick L Smart, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: August 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT - VACATED | ||
September 07, 2021 | STIPULATION - VACATE JUDGMENT | ||
August 02, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Non-Military Affirmation and Search |
||
August 02, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Service Invoice |
||
August 02, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR Contract Redacted |
||
August 02, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 02, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 07, 2021 | Affidavit of Mailing | ||
June 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PATRICK L. SMART - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
June 04, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.