Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Barbara Shields Estate Of, Robert As Admin Shields As Administrator Of The Estate Of Barbara Shields, Deceased, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Kirwan, Terry J., against Auburn Eye Care Center Lp, represented by Fatcheric, Maureen G., Skuce, Erin Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel J Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Doyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Wrongful Death) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
COMPLAINT
Date: May 19, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2023 | ORDER - MEDIATION | ||
April 04, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
March 31, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter Order |
||
March 02, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 02, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 04, 2021 |
ANSWER Verified Answer |
||
June 01, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 19, 2021 | COMPLAINT | ||
May 19, 2021 | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.