Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Berkshire Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Levine, Louis, against Staci Nickerson, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Mark H Fandrich presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark H Fandrich Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #01)
Date: July 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 14, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
July 13, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
July 12, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) | ||
July 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #01) contract |
||
July 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #01) AOS |
||
July 12, 2021 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
July 12, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
July 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #01) SC |
||
July 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #01) military search |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.