Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ann M Crowley, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Orkin, Jonathan Andrew, against James M Crowley, represented by Buschman, Steven Howard, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Shannon J Pero presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShannon J Pero Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 04, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
January 04, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
December 13, 2021 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
December 13, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
December 13, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
December 10, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 20, 2021 | SEPARATION AGREEMENT | ||
October 19, 2021 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
October 19, 2021 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.