Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mb Financial Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Ae Mautaga, Jessica Fox, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, Kristen A Thomas, Sean R Thomas, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Mark H Fandrich presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark H Fandrich Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
April 28, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
December 02, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER OF REFERENCE NORMAN J CHIRCO ESQ AS REFEREE & REPLACE JOHN DOE 1&2 WITH MAUTAGE AE & JESSICA F ORDER OF REFERENCE NORMAN J CHIRCO ESQ AS REFEREE & REPLACE JOHN DOE 1&2 WITH MAUTAGE AE & JESSICA F ... show more |
||
November 01, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER OF REFERENCE |
||
September 17, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AFFT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
September 17, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER OF REFERENCE |
||
September 17, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MOTION APPLICATION |
||
June 13, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
||
April 01, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RJI RJI Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
March 12, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.