Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Keybank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Glen E Hill, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas G Leone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas G Leone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
May 11, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
June 20, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER OF REFERENCE & DEFAULT JUDGMENT ANN E BUNKER ESQ AS REFEREE REMOVE JOHN DOE 1-50 AND MARY ROE ORDER OF REFERENCE & DEFAULT JUDGMENT ANN E BUNKER ESQ AS REFEREE REMOVE JOHN DOE 1-50 AND MARY ROE ... show more |
||
May 08, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER |
||
May 01, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ATTY AFFIRM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A DEFAULT JUDGMENT & ORDER OF REFERENCE |
||
May 01, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFT OF MERIT & AMOUNT DUE |
||
May 01, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MOTION APPLICATION |
||
May 01, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RJI |
||
April 30, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFT OF MAILING OF ADDITIONAL SUMMONS PURSUANT TO CPLR 3215 |
||
April 16, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFT OF MAILING OF ADDITIONAL SUMMONS PURSUANT TO CPLR 3215 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.