Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTaddeo, Hon. Ann Marie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 16, 2017 |
CategoryTort-Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2021 | Hearing |
Granted to the Extent of the Order (Motion #005)
Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
|
September 28, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #005)
Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
|
July 29, 2021 | Hearing | MEDIATION | |
June 04, 2021 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #005) Decided: 11/03/2021Granted to the Extent of the Order Before Justice: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie Answer demanded: No Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
|
June 03, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned MEDIATION |
|
April 13, 2021 | Hearing |
Held MEDIATION |
|
April 05, 2021 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #004)
Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
|
April 05, 2021 | Hearing |
Dismissed (Motion #003)
Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
|
April 05, 2021 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
|
April 05, 2021 | Hearing |
Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.