Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Eaglemark Savings Bank, Harley Davidson Credit Corp As Assignee, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Powietrzynski, Aleksander P, against Ashley Mcdonough The Persons Or Parties Intended To Be In Possession Of The Collateral Known As A 2020 Harley-Davidson Flhxs Street Glide Special, Steven Pleszewski The Persons Or Parties Intended To Be In Possession Of The Collateral Known As A 2020 Harley-Davidson Flhxs Street Glide Special, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with Ronald D Ploetz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald D Ploetz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: June 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 09, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 13, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Exhibit A to S&C - Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: June 09, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 09, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 09, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 28, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 05, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 06, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: September 08, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2022 |
ORDER - DISMISSAL & BOND IS TERMINATED |
||
September 06, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 06, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
August 17, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 14, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Order/Decision |
||
July 05, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 28, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | ||
June 13, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
June 09, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | ||
June 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR S&C Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.