Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Eldon King Jr, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kurtzhalts, Joel Redmond, against Vcna United Materials Llc, represented by Sanchez, John Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with Terrence M. Parker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerrence M. Parker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 28, 2022ANSWER
Date: October 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Supplemental Affidavit |
||
March 01, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 01, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 01, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEFAULT | ||
October 12, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
June 28, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 20, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.