Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Casey Baer, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Vella, Emily A., against Samuel Baer, represented by Calabrese, Calcedonio Wade, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with Ronald D Ploetz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald D Ploetz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 21, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 16, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - a | ||
December 16, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
December 02, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT | ||
December 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 03, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
September 09, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
September 02, 2022 | ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
August 10, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.