Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Adam C Madigan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Walier, Paul Stephen, against Tina M Madigan, represented by Benson, Michael Albert, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with Terrence M. Parker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerrence M. Parker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 09, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2022 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
September 20, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
September 14, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
September 14, 2022 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
September 14, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 14, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
July 22, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 15, 2022 | TRANSFER OF FILE ON CHANGE OF VENUE | ||
May 10, 2022 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
May 10, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.