Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
R Donald Benson, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Vella, Emily A., against Lucy Benson, represented by Webb, Paul V., Adams, Joan Casilio, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with Terrence M. Parker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerrence M. Parker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 09, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2022 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
November 23, 2022 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
November 23, 2022 | DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL | ||
November 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 21, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
September 23, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 01, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 24, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
June 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 09, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.