Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Community Bank N A, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Daniel J Skiver, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: May 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 13, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 11, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 13, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: January 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 13, 2023SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: March 02, 2023SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: March 02, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
March 02, 2023 |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) |
||
January 19, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 13, 2023 | Affidavit of Mailing a Copy of the Summons | ||
January 13, 2023 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
January 13, 2023 | Affidavit of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
January 13, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
January 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B History |
||
January 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Military Search |
||
January 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.