Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corp, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Chance M White, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 03, 2022EXECUTION
Date: July 14, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 |
EXECUTION UNSATISFIED INCOME EXECUTION |
||
September 23, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION | ||
September 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 21, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS OF DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | ||
September 21, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION |
||
September 21, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* TMP#463996 |
||
September 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 23, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 03, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.