Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Northwest Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Burke, Michael David, against Jarod T Poulin, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with Ronald D Ploetz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald D Ploetz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 23, 2022AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: March 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 24, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
March 23, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 23, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
March 23, 2022 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
March 23, 2022 |
INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT MILITARY STATUS REPORT |
||
March 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 23, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
March 23, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.