Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Allison M Culbertson, Jeffrey C Culbertson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Habberfield, Kevin Marc, against David F Rakus, Tammy S Caston, represented by Graff, Kevin Jay, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: August 09, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 01, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 03, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 03, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 08, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
November 08, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND DISCOVERY RESPONSES |
||
November 08, 2021 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
September 03, 2021 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
September 03, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
August 11, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVICE ON DAVID F RAKUS |
||
August 11, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVICE ON TAMMY S CASTON |
||
August 09, 2021 |
INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING |
||
August 09, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.