Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
C L, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Forbes, Randall Vanessa, Kolodny, Michelle Rivlin, Slater, Alexandra Dorothy, against Cattaraugus County, Does 1-10, G A Family Services, Gustavus Adolphus Child & Family Services D B A, represented by Elliott, Ericka Bliss, Fitch, David Hogan, Roloff, Jill Rachel, Yonkers, Jill Liane, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel J Furlong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Furlong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: June 30, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 30, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 02, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: June 30, 2021SUMMONS
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 13, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 17, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: July 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: July 19, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: September 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 19, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 16, 2021STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: June 08, 2022SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: December 17, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: December 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 11, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 17, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 13, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 16, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: October 10, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) *Corrected*
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 13, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 08, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: September 19, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 02, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 04, 2022ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: November 14, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 12, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: March 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
December 12, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Stipulation and Order - proposed |
||
November 14, 2022 | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
November 08, 2022 |
ANSWER Defendant, Gustavus Adolphus Child & Family Services d/b/a G.A. Family Services Answer to Amended Co Defendant, Gustavus Adolphus Child & Family Services d/b/a G.A. Family Services Answer to Amended Co ... show more |
||
November 08, 2022 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant, Gustavus Adolphus Child & Family Services d/b/a G.A. Family Services Answer to Co-Defenda Defendant, Gustavus Adolphus Child & Family Services d/b/a G.A. Family Services Answer to Co-Defenda ... show more |
||
November 04, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) Denying motion to dismiss |
||
November 02, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
October 10, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
September 19, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 19, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.