Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Olean Area Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, against Bautista Hermelando A K A, Feria Hermelando A K A, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 28, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: June 16, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 04, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - a
Date: June 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: June 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 22, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 17, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 16, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
June 16, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
June 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a military verification |
||
October 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING CPLR 3215 |
||
August 04, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
August 04, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.