Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Russell E Capron, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: November 06, 2019CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: June 07, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2021 |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) |
||
October 29, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
October 06, 2021 |
EXECUTION SATISFIED INCOME EXECUTION |
||
July 06, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1314871 |
||
June 23, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1314871 |
||
June 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1314871 |
||
June 23, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1314871 | ||
June 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1314871 |
||
June 07, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.