Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Five Star Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mcandrew, John Kevin, against John Doe, Shawn M Churakos, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts Cattaraugus County Supreme Court with Jeremiah Moriarty presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeremiah Moriarty Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseCattaraugus County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time166 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 24, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) MAILED TO DEFS 1/6/20 |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER ORDER REMOVING MATTER FROM FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PART |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT of Tenant mailing |
|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Doe |
|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Shawn |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO EFILING | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.