Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb As Trustee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brennan, Jennifer R., Manniello, Michael C, Perciballi, Nicholas Emilio, against Brook Wagatha, Corey Teddy, Dale Wagatha Sr, Lori Wagatha, New York State Department Taxation & Finance, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with Terrence M. Parker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerrence M. Parker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 04, 2021FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: March 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #10)
Date: December 22, 2021NOTICE OF SALE
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3) NOTICE OF DEFAULT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 04, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: March 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3) MORTGAGE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3) ASSIGNMENTS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 04, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 04, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3) 90-DAY NOTICE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #10)
Date: December 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 04, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 04, 2021BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 04, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3) NOTE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 04, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 04, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 16, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 04, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: May 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 17, 2021ORDER - REFERENCE Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
March 25, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
January 11, 2022 |
NOTICE OF SALE SALE SCHEDULED FOR 3.17.2022 |
||
December 22, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #10) TO CONFIRM REFEREE REPORT AND FOR A JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE |
||
December 22, 2021 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
December 20, 2021 |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (AMENDS CAPTION) |
||
December 14, 2021 |
BILL OF COSTS (Motion #10) AMENDED BILL OF COSTS |
||
December 14, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 18, 2021 | PROOF OF SERVICE - COURT NOTICE | ||
November 17, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #10) 90DN'S & POF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.