Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. MICHAEL L. NENNO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2016 |
CategoryRes. Foreclosure Conf Eligible |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time550 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
March 01, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED NENNO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
December 02, 2015 | Hearing |
Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
August 05, 2015 | Hearing |
Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
May 06, 2015 | Hearing |
CONTINUED NENNO (Settlement Conference) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
September 03, 2014 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
September 03, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
August 29, 2014 | Motion |
ORDER OF REFERENCE; ATTY ADELS (Motion #001) Decided: 09/03/2014GRANTED SIGNED AND PAPERS TO A Before Justice: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
August 29, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.