Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with Jeremiah J. Moriarty presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeremiah J. Moriarty Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2015 |
CategoryContested Matrimonial |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time236 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #003) MORIARTY, ESQ (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
May 05, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #003) MORIARTY, ESQ (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
May 05, 2015 | Hearing |
POST-DECIDED MORIARTY, ESQ (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
May 04, 2015 | Motion |
JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (Motion #003) Decided: 05/05/2015GRANTED SIGNED AND PAPERS TO A Before Justice: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY Answer demanded: No Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
May 04, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #003) MORIARTY, ESQ (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
May 04, 2015 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED MORIARTY, ESQ (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
April 15, 2015 | Motion |
DECISION; FINDINGS OF FACT (Motion #002) Decided: 04/15/2015SIGNED AND ORIG TO COUNTY CLER Before Justice: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY Answer demanded: No Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
April 15, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) MORIARTY, ESQ (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
April 15, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) MORIARTY, ESQ (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
April 15, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) MORIARTY, ESQ (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.